TN SJR0913 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-17 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article II, Section 31 of the Constitution of Tennessee authorizing the governing body or state official charged with carrying out the purpose or objectives of a fund or trust that is administered or invested by the Treasury and that contains state funds, in whole or in part, to adopt, with approval of the Treasurer and the Comptroller of the Treasury, an investment policy to authorize all or part of such fund or trust to be invested such that the state would become an owner, in whole or in part, of any bank or a stockholder with others in any association, company, or corporation.
Title
A RESOLUTION to propose an amendment to Article II, Section 31 of the Constitution of Tennessee, to allow the investment of state funds in equities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-27 | House | Concurred, Ayes 78, Nays 11, PNV 1 |
2022-04-25 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/22 |
2022-04-21 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HJR |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |