TN SJR0899 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Roy Bell and David O'Guin Memorial Bridge," S.R. 438 in Perry County
Title
"Roy Bell and David O'Guin Memorial Bridge," S.R. 438 in Perry County
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-04-20 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-05 | Ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-04-01 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-04-01 | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 04/01/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-03-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-03-25 | Filed for intro. |