TN SJR0893 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee w/ negative recommendation
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee w/ negative recommendation
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article XI, Section 5 of the Constitution of Tennessee, to allow for bingo games conducted by congressionally chartered nonprofit veterans organizations that are tax-exempt as 501(c)(19) organizations to meet charitable, not-for-profit, or community service purposes.
Title
Proposes an amendment to Article XI, Section 5 of the Constitution of Tennessee, to allow for bingo games conducted by congressionally chartered nonprofit veterans organizations that are tax-exempt as 501(c)(19) organizations to meet charitable, not-for-profit, or community service purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee with a Negative Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |