TN SJR0888 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Failed for lack of motion in: Delayed Bill Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Failed for lack of motion in: Delayed Bill Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"Williams Syndrome Awareness Month," May 2020
Title
"Williams Syndrome Awareness Month," May 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommend for Concurence, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommend for Concurence, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Failed for lack of motion in: Delayed Bill Committee |
2020-05-29 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |