TN SJR0886 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Raja J. Jubran, UT board of trustees
Title
Raja J. Jubran, UT board of trustees
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Education Committee 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0886&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/SJR0886.pdf |