TN SJR0885 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article I, Section 35 of the Constitution of Tennessee for the purpose of rewriting the rights to which crime victims are entitled.
Title
Proposes an amendment to Article I, Section 35 of the Constitution of Tennessee for the purpose of rewriting the rights to which crime victims are entitled.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/24/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |