TN SJR0836 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies the increase of the 911 surcharge rate to $1.50 as approved by the Tennessee Emergency Communications Board.
Title
Ratifies the increase of the 911 surcharge rate to $1.50 as approved by the Tennessee Emergency Communications Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Date Certain (Y: 8 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Date Certain (Y: 8 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Returned by Governor without signature. |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-19 | House | Concurred, Ayes 83, Nays 5, PNV 1 |
2020-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-19 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 20, Nays 8, PNV 1 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | R/S Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 3/17/20 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |