TN SJR0781 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Theron Ira Louis Lacy
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Theron Ira Louis Lacy of Nashville.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2023-04-20 | House | Concurred, vv. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0781&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SJR0781.pdf |