TN SJR0774 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on January 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Darlene Walker Schlicher

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Darlene Walker Schlicher on the occasion of her retirement from the General Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-20SenateSigned by Governor.
2022-01-19SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2022-01-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2022-01-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2022-01-19SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2022-01-19HouseConcurred, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 1
2022-01-13HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1/19/22
2022-01-13SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2022-01-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2022-01-13SenateRules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2022-01-12SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2022-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback