TN SJR0762 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Haylee Ferguson, Governor's Volunteer Stars Award
Title
Haylee Ferguson, Governor's Volunteer Stars Award
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-02-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-02-06 | House | Concurred, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-02-05 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/6/20 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/3/2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |