TN SJR0744 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/11/2020
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/11/2020
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Marcie Rudd, Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Title
Marcie Rudd, Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/5/2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0744&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/SJR0744.pdf |