TN SJR0726 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm.
Pending: House Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm.
Pending: House Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Encourages the Tennessee Higher Education Suicide Prevention Task Force and the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services to develop and implement higher education specific protocols for the prevention, intervention, and postvention of death by suicide.
Title
Encourages the Tennessee Higher Education Suicide Prevention Task Force and the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services to develop and implement higher education specific protocols for the prevention, intervention, and postvention of death by suicide.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |