TN SJR0690 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Kelly Wolfe, Board of Trustees of East Tennessee State University
Title
Kelly Wolfe, Board of Trustees of East Tennessee State University
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 39 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 39 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 39 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Failed to concur, Ayes 40, Nays 48, PNV 2 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/3/2020 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 1/30/2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 1/29/2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |