TN SJR0658 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Carrie Stovall, Cumberland Heights Elementary School Grades 5-8 Teacher of the Year

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize Carrie Stovall on her selection as the 2022–2023 Cumberland Heights Elementary School Grades 5-8 Teacher of the Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-04-28SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-04-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-25SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-21HouseConcurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-04-21HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 4/21/2023
2023-04-21SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-04-21SenateAdopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2023-04-20SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/21/2023
2023-04-20SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-04-19SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-04-18SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback