TN SJR0657 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-6)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Jim Shulman

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor Jim Shulman for nearly thirty years of service to the State of Tennessee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-14SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-14HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-03HouseConcurred, Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-04-29HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/3/21
2021-04-29SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-29SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/29/2021
2021-04-29SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-27SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback