TN SJR0655 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Abigayle Smith, Valedictorian, Middle High School
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and recognize Abigayle Smith, 2021 Valedictorian of Middle High School.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0655&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SJR0655.pdf |