TN SJR0627 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Ryan Kirst, Prudential Spirit of Community Award.
Title
Ryan Kirst, Prudential Spirit of Community Award.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/13/14 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/10/2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Filed for intro. |