TN SJR0626 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/3/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/3/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Directs board of trustees to work with university administration to implement changes to the assessment and allocation of the student activity fees within the University of Tennessee system; requires report to chairs of education committees by January 1, 2015.
Title
Directs board of trustees to work with university administration to implement changes to the assessment and allocation of the student activity fees within the University of Tennessee system; requires report to chairs of education committees by January 1, 2015.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 23, Nays 6, PNV 3 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. Ed. Comm. 3/5/2014 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Filed for intro. |