TN SJR0625 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Chase Barger, State Leadership and Skills Conference of SkillsUSA

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chase Barger, State Leadership and Skills Conference of SkillsUSA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-05-07SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-05-07HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-07SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-07SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-05-01HouseConcurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-05-01HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 5/1/19
2019-05-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-05-01SenateAdopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-05-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/1/2019
2019-04-30SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback