TN SJR0618 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Reverend Billy Graham
Title
Reverend Billy Graham
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-02-26 | House | Concurred, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 2-26-18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |