TN SJR0617 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Nashville Public Library, 2017 Library of the Year Award
Title
Nashville Public Library, 2017 Library of the Year Award
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-05 | House | Concurred, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-03-01 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 3-5-18 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |