TN SJR0609 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Re-ref. Naming & Designating
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

T.J. Osborne

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to commend and honor country music artist T.J. Osborne.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR REFER TO COMMITTEE MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 63 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION REFER TO COMMITTEE MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseRe-ref. Naming & Designating
2021-04-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/21
2021-04-29HouseObjected to on Consent Calendar.
2021-04-28HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/29/2021
2021-04-28SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-28SenateAdopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-19SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback