TN SJR0590 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans & Safety Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans & Safety Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Federal Aviation Administration to institute protective measures for musical instruments.
Title
Urges Federal Aviation Administration to institute protective measures for musical instruments.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Trans & Safety Comm. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Trans & Safety Comm. to 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. T&S Comm. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0590&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SJR0590.pdf |