TN SJR0559 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Arab American Heritage Month

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to commemorate National Arab American Heritage Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-04-14SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-04-11SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-11SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-04-10HouseConcurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-04-06HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/10/2023
2023-04-06SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-04-06SenateRules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
2023-04-05SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback