TN SJR0559 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Samuel Underwood, State Leadership and Skills Conference of SkillsUSA

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Samuel Underwood, State Leadership and Skills Conference of SkillsUSA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-05-02HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-01SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-30HouseConcurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-30HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/30/19
2019-04-30SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-29SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/29/2019
2019-04-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-24SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-22SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback