TN SJR0555 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Eva Davis Fyke, 100th birthday
Title
Eva Davis Fyke, 100th birthday
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0555&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SJR0555.pdf |