TN SJR0554 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/23/2018
Pending: House Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/23/2018
Pending: House Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Encourages the bureau of TennCare to improve access to and quality of treatment for eligible Tennessee residents suffering from addiction to opiates and other substances by means of appropriate federal Section 1115 waiver for Medicaid services.
Title
Encourages the bureau of TennCare to improve access to and quality of treatment for eligible Tennessee residents suffering from addiction to opiates and other substances by means of appropriate federal Section 1115 waiver for Medicaid services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/23/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-03-26 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |