TN SJR0546 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tallest Post Oak in the United States
Title
Tallest Post Oak in the United States
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-23 | House | Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/23/19 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |