TN SJR0521 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article III, Section 12 of the Constitution of Tennessee to provide for the exercise of powers and duties of the governor during disability.
Title
Proposes an amendment to Article III, Section 12 of the Constitution of Tennessee to provide for the exercise of powers and duties of the governor during disability.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-04-04 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 3/29/18 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended on 2nd Reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 3/28/18 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended on First Reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0657) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. S&L Govt. Comm. 3-13-18 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Pursuant to Rule 84(1) Referred to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/13/2018 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |