TN SJR0517 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
100th anniversary of the passage of 1921 Public Chapter 95
Title
AN ACT granting women the right to vote for electors of President and Vice President of the United States, and for municipal officers"; under this law, women in Tennessee could now vote in most elections, but the bar to holding public office remained; and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/22/21 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |