TN SJR0514 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Senator Rosalind Kurita

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senator Rosalind Kurita

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-18SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-17SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-17HouseConcurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-16HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/17/19
2019-04-16SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-15SenateRules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
2019-04-15SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback