TN SJR0506 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates October 2018 as "Eczema Awareness Month" in Tennessee.
Title
Designates October 2018 as "Eczema Awareness Month" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-09 | House | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-26 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Health & Welfare Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |