TN SJR0497 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Calls joint convention on April 12, 2021, to confirm appointment of Jill Bartee Ayers to Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals, Middle Section, and to honor former U.S. Senator and former Tennessee Governor Lamar Alexander.
Title
A RESOLUTION to call a joint convention of the Senate and the House of Representatives.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |