TN SJR0493 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Ref. to State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Ref. to State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Makes application to the U.S. Congress to call a constitutional convention for the sole purpose of proposing a federal balanced budget amendment.
Title
Makes application to the U.S. Congress to call a constitutional convention for the sole purpose of proposing a federal balanced budget amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Adopted as am., Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0692) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/6/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/11/2014 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 1/28/2014 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Filed for intro. |