TN SJR0483 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-21 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

McKenzie High School girls' basketball team, TSSAA Division I, Class A champions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to congratulate the McKenzie High School girls' basketball team upon winning the TSSAA Division I, Class A state championship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-04-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-04-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-04-14SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-04-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-04-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-13HouseConcurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-04-10HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/13/2023
2023-04-06SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-04-06SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2023-04-06SenateAdopted, Ayes 0, Nays 0
2023-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/6/2023
2023-04-03SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-03-29SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback