TN SJR0480 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Mrs. Essie Vanleer Kirkman Gilbert, 100th birthday
Title
Mrs. Essie Vanleer Kirkman Gilbert, 100th birthday
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-02-22 | House | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/22/18 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |