TN SJR0477 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Horace Michael Shultz, Jr., Phi Theta Kappa All-Tennessee Academic Team Nominee
Title
Horace Michael Shultz, Jr., Phi Theta Kappa All-Tennessee Academic Team Nominee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-02-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-02-07 | House | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-02-05 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 2-7-18 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/17/2018 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |