TN SJR0475 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

LaStacia S. Cloyd, 2019 Boys & Girls Clubs of Greater Memphis Youth of the Year

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LaStacia S. Cloyd, 2019 Boys & Girls Clubs of Greater Memphis Youth of the Year

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseConcurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-22HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/22/19
2019-04-18SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-18SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-09SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback