TN SJR0472 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Jacen "Jace" Wilder
Title
A RESOLUTION to commend Jacen "Jace" Wilder for exemplary service as a legislative intern.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | House | Held on desk. |
2021-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-19 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/19/21 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |