TN SJR0468 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]


Hartsville, 200th anniversary

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Hartsville, 200th anniversary


Roll Calls

2018-01-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]


2018-01-23SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-01-22SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-01-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-01-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-01-18SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-01-18HouseConcurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
2018-01-17HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 1-18-18
2018-01-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-01-11SenateAdopted, Ayes 27, Nays 0
2018-01-10SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/11/2018
2018-01-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-11-15SenateFiled for introduction


Tennessee State Sources

Bill Comments