TN SJR0467 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2016 - 75% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the commencement of legal action, seeking declaratory and injunctive relief, from the federal government's mandated appropriation of state revenue and noncompliance with the Refugee Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commencement of legal action, seeking declaratory and injunctive relief, from the federal government's mandated appropriation of state revenue and noncompliance with the Refugee Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-20SenateReturned by Governor without signature.
2016-05-09SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-04-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-26SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-26SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-04-19SenateConcurred, Ayes 29, Nays 4 (Amendment 1 - HA1060)
2016-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
2016-04-18HouseConcurred as am., Ayes 69, Nays 25, PNV 0
2016-04-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1060)
2016-04-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2016
2016-04-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2016
2016-04-12HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2016-04-06HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/12/2016
2016-04-06HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-03-30HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2016
2016-03-30HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2016-03-29HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-03-23HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/29/2016
2016-03-22HouseAction def. in State Government Committee to 3/29/2016
2016-03-16HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/22/2016
2016-03-16HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2016-03-09HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
2016-02-25HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2016-02-25HouseRef. to State Government Committee
2016-02-22SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-02-22SenateAdopted, Ayes 27, Nays 5
2016-02-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2016
2016-02-17SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-16SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2016-02-10SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/16/2016
2016-02-09SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-27SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-25SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-01-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback