TN SJR0465 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Janet Smith, Karns Middle School, Knox County Middle School Teacher of the Year

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Janet Smith, Karns Middle School, Knox County Middle School Teacher of the Year

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-24SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-23HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-22HouseConcurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-22HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/22/19
2019-04-18SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-18SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-08SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback