TN SJR0465 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Chris Lantz
Title
Chris Lantz
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: Consent Calendar PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-27 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-21 | Concurred, Ayes 83, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-21 | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/21/11 | |
2011-05-21 | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-21 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-05-21 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Filed for intro. | |
2011-05-20 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |