TN SJR0460 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the development and implementation of additional specialized mental health crisis intervention training for law enforcement officers.
Title
Urges the development and implementation of additional specialized mental health crisis intervention training for law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-19 | House | Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-17 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |