TN SJR0452 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
James "Jimmy" Harden
Title
James "Jimmy" Harden
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-29 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/29/19 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |