TN SJR0433 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Sherri Morgan, Teacher of the Year and Outstanding Service to Students Award, Greene County Schools
Title
Sherri Morgan, Teacher of the Year and Outstanding Service to Students Award, Greene County Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-17 | House | Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/17/19 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |