TN SJR0403 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

University of Tennessee Volunteers men's basketball team

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Tennessee Volunteers men's basketball team

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-08SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-04HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-04SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-04SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-04HouseR/S Concurred, v.v.
2019-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-04SenateRules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-04-03SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback