TN SJR0402 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Family Meals Month, September 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Meals Month, September 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-05-01SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-05-01HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-01SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-29HouseConcurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-24HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/29/19
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-24SenateAdopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/24/2019
2019-04-16SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Commerce and Labor Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-11SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Commerce & Labor Comm. 4/16/19
2019-04-09SenateRefer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2019-04-09SenateRecalled from Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2019-04-08SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2019-04-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-03SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback