TN SJR0369 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joseph Interrante
Title
Joseph Interrante
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-11 | House | Concurred, Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/11/19 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |