TN SJR0367 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tim Sigler
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor Tim Sigler for his exemplary service to Lieutenant Governor Randy McNally and the members of the Senate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-08 | House | Concurred, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-05 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/8/21 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |